House | 05/13/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3348 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1889 | Journal Page: 3347 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3189 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3189 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 2525 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1446 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 718 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 718 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |