Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#355 | Journal Page: 1865 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1816 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1816 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Amended | 1-Howard | Journal Page: 1815 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |