Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2052 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2052
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to loss damage waivers in connection with the rental of
 certain heavy equipment; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 93 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 93. LOSS DAMAGE WAIVERS FOR RENTAL OF CERTAIN HEAVY
 EQUIPMENT
 Sec. 93.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Customer" means a person who rents heavy
 equipment under a rental agreement.
 (2)  "Heavy equipment" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 23.1241, Tax Code.
 (3)  "Heavy equipment loss damage waiver" means a
 merchant's agreement to not hold a customer liable for loss from all
 or part of any damage to heavy equipment.
 (4)  "Merchant" means a person who, in the ordinary
 course of business, regularly rents, offers to rent, or arranges
 for the rental of heavy equipment under a rental agreement.
 (5)  "Rental agreement" means an agreement under which
 a customer pays a fee or other consideration to rent heavy
 equipment.
 Sec. 93.002.  CONTRACT FOR LOSS DAMAGE WAIVER. A customer
 may contract with a merchant for a heavy equipment loss damage
 waiver in connection with a rental agreement.
 Sec. 93.003.  RESTRICTIONS ON MERCHANT CONCERNING WAIVER. A
 merchant may not:
 (1)  sell a heavy equipment loss damage waiver unless:
 (A)  the contract containing the waiver complies
 with this chapter; and
 (B)  the customer agrees to the waiver in writing;
 or
 (2)  impose or require the purchase of a heavy
 equipment loss damage waiver as a condition of entering into a
 rental agreement.
 Sec. 93.004.  REQUIRED NOTICE. A contract that offers a
 heavy equipment loss damage waiver must include the following
 notice:
 "This contract offers an optional loss damage waiver for an
 additional charge to cover your responsibility for loss of or
 damage to the heavy equipment. You do not have to purchase this
 coverage. Before deciding whether to purchase this loss damage
 waiver, you may consider whether your insurance policies afford you
 coverage for loss of or damage to the heavy equipment rented and the
 amount of the deductible you would pay under your policies."
 Sec. 93.005.  STATEMENT OF TOTAL CHARGE. A heavy equipment
 loss damage waiver agreement must include a statement of the total
 charge for the waiver.
 Sec. 93.006.  AUTHORIZED EXCLUSIONS. A heavy equipment loss
 damage waiver may exclude:
 (1)  loss of or damage to the heavy equipment that is
 caused by an unexplained disappearance or abandonment of the heavy
 equipment;
 (2)  damage that is intentionally caused by the
 customer; or
 (3)  damage that results from the customer's wilful or
 wanton misconduct.
 Sec. 93.007.  RELATIONSHIP TO INSURANCE. A heavy equipment
 loss damage waiver is not insurance.
 Sec. 93.008.  CIVIL PENALTY. A merchant that violates this
 chapter is liable for a civil penalty in an amount of not less than
 $500 or more than $1,000 for each act of violation.
 Sec. 93.009.  INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. A person injured or
 threatened with injury by a violation of this chapter may seek
 injunctive relief against the person committing or threatening to
 commit the violation.
 Sec. 93.010.  SUIT FOR CIVIL PENALTY OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF.
 The attorney general or a county or district attorney may bring an
 action in the name of the state for a civil penalty under Section
 93.008, injunctive relief under Section 93.009, or both.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a rental agreement entered into on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A rental agreement entered into before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the rental
 agreement was entered into, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *