E
|
06/19/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4853
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4848
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4849
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1577
|
Journal Page: 4848
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4848
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1942
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#413
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Farney
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|