E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4319
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4319
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1374
|
Journal Page: 4319
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4319
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4109
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#328
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 681
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 681
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|