Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2067 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2067
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rescission or waiver of an acceleration of the
 maturity date of certain debt secured by a lien on real property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 16, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 16.038 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.038.  RESCISSION OR WAIVER OF ACCELERATED MATURITY
 DATE. (a)  If the maturity date of a series of notes or obligations
 or a note or obligation payable in installments is accelerated, and
 the accelerated maturity date is rescinded or waived in accordance
 with this section before the limitations period expires, the
 acceleration is deemed rescinded and waived and the note,
 obligation, or series of notes or obligations shall be governed by
 Section 16.035 as if no acceleration had occurred.
 (b)  Rescission or waiver of acceleration is effective if
 made by a written notice of a rescission or waiver served as
 provided in Subsection (c) by the lienholder, the servicer of the
 debt, or an attorney representing the lienholder on each debtor
 who, according to the records of the lienholder or the servicer of
 the debt, is obligated to pay the debt.
 (c)  Service of a notice under Subsection (b) must be by
 first class or certified mail and is complete when the notice is
 deposited in the United States mail, postage prepaid and addressed
 to the debtor at the debtor's last known address. The affidavit of
 a person knowledgeable of the facts to the effect that service was
 completed is prima facie evidence of service.
 (d)  A notice served under this section does not affect a
 lienholder's right to accelerate the maturity date of the debt in
 the future nor does it waive past defaults.
 (e)  This section does not create an exclusive method for
 waiver and rescission of acceleration or affect the accrual of a
 cause of action and the running of the related limitations period
 under Section 16.035(e) on any subsequent maturity date,
 accelerated or otherwise, of the note or obligation or series of
 notes or obligations.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies with
 respect to a maturity date accelerated before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act and any notice of a rescission or waiver
 of an accelerated maturity date served before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *