LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2076
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2076
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2076
Compare Versions
HB2076 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2076 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2076 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB2076 Comm Sub May 25, 2015
HB2076 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB2076 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
HB2076 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2076 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2076 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2076 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB2076 Comm Sub May 25, 2015
HB2076 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB2076 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
HB2076 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare