E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#409
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#393
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
2-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|