Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2083 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2015

                    By: Darby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2083
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 12, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 6, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of the appraised value of property
 for purposes of an ad valorem tax protest or appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.01, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  The selection of comparable properties and the
 application of appropriate adjustments for the determination of an
 appraised value of property by any person under Section 41.43(b)(3)
 or 42.26(a)(3) must be based on the application of generally
 accepted appraisal methods and techniques. Adjustments must be
 based on recognized methods and techniques that are necessary to
 produce a credible opinion.
 (g)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 property owners representing themselves are entitled to offer an
 opinion of and present argument and evidence related to the market
 and appraised value or the inequality of appraisal of the owner's
 property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *