LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2084
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2084
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2084
Compare Versions
HB2084 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2084 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2084 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB2084 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB2084 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2084 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB2084 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2084 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2084 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2084 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB2084 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB2084 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2084 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB2084 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare