Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1345 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#592 | Journal Page: 2482 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 683 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 683 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |