LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB21
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB21
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB21
Compare Versions
HB21 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB21 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB21 Enrolled May 24, 2015
HB21 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB21 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB21 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
HB21 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB21 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB21 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB21 Enrolled May 24, 2015
HB21 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB21 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB21 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
HB21 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare