E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1335
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Garcia
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|