House | 04/22/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1811 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 903 | Journal Page: 1811 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Filed |