10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to a medal for certain members of the military forces who |
---|
12 | 6 | | served during the Cold War. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 437.355, Government Code, is reenacted |
---|
15 | 9 | | to incorporate amendments made to Section 431.134, Government Code, |
---|
16 | 10 | | by Chapter 243 (H.B. 402), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular |
---|
17 | 11 | | Session, 2013, and amended to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 12 | | Sec. 437.355. OTHER AWARDS. (a) The governor or adjutant |
---|
19 | 13 | | general, if delegated the authority, may adopt policies and |
---|
20 | 14 | | regulations relating to awarding: |
---|
21 | 15 | | (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be |
---|
22 | 16 | | awarded to a service member who, after September 11, 2001: |
---|
23 | 17 | | (A) was inducted into federal service from the |
---|
24 | 18 | | Texas National Guard; and |
---|
25 | 19 | | (B) meets the criteria for an award of the |
---|
26 | 20 | | federal Purple Heart Medal; |
---|
27 | 21 | | (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
28 | 22 | | awarded to: |
---|
29 | 23 | | (A) a service member of the Texas military forces |
---|
30 | 24 | | who has: |
---|
31 | 25 | | (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable |
---|
32 | 26 | | state service or a combination of state and federal service; and |
---|
33 | 27 | | (ii) continually demonstrated superior |
---|
34 | 28 | | performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions |
---|
35 | 29 | | demanding responsibility; or |
---|
36 | 30 | | (B) a civilian who has contributed significant |
---|
37 | 31 | | service to the Texas military forces; |
---|
38 | 32 | | (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which |
---|
39 | 33 | | shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state, |
---|
40 | 34 | | another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding |
---|
41 | 35 | | achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of |
---|
42 | 36 | | great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces |
---|
43 | 37 | | for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for |
---|
44 | 38 | | award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that: |
---|
45 | 39 | | (A) gives an account of the exceptional |
---|
46 | 40 | | achievement or service; and |
---|
47 | 41 | | (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts |
---|
48 | 42 | | from official documents to support and amplify the facts; |
---|
49 | 43 | | (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall |
---|
50 | 44 | | be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state, |
---|
51 | 45 | | another state, or the United States who has performed service in a |
---|
52 | 46 | | superior and clearly outstanding manner; |
---|
53 | 47 | | (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall |
---|
54 | 48 | | be awarded to a service member who: |
---|
55 | 49 | | (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the |
---|
56 | 50 | | federal Humanitarian Service Medal; |
---|
57 | 51 | | (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and |
---|
58 | 52 | | (C) while serving on state active duty or active |
---|
59 | 53 | | duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United |
---|
60 | 54 | | States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
61 | 55 | | mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during |
---|
62 | 56 | | or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state; |
---|
63 | 57 | | (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which |
---|
64 | 58 | | shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces |
---|
65 | 59 | | who served: |
---|
66 | 60 | | (A) on or after September 11, 2001; |
---|
67 | 61 | | (B) on state active duty or active duty under |
---|
68 | 62 | | state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code; |
---|
69 | 63 | | and |
---|
70 | 64 | | (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
71 | 65 | | mission in the state under civilian authority; |
---|
72 | 66 | | (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded |
---|
73 | 67 | | to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the |
---|
74 | 68 | | Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or |
---|
75 | 69 | | after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days; |
---|
76 | 70 | | (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be |
---|
77 | 71 | | awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served, |
---|
78 | 72 | | after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by |
---|
79 | 73 | | the United States secretary of defense; |
---|
80 | 74 | | (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
81 | 75 | | awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed |
---|
82 | 76 | | five years of honorable service during which the service member has |
---|
83 | 77 | | shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to |
---|
84 | 78 | | this state; |
---|
85 | 79 | | (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded |
---|
86 | 80 | | to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or |
---|
87 | 81 | | the United States who performs outstanding service or attains |
---|
88 | 82 | | extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States; |
---|
89 | 83 | | (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall |
---|
90 | 84 | | be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive |
---|
91 | 85 | | years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the |
---|
92 | 86 | | service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and |
---|
93 | 87 | | great loyalty to this state; |
---|
94 | 88 | | (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign |
---|
95 | 89 | | Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted |
---|
96 | 90 | | into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, |
---|
97 | 91 | | 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert |
---|
98 | 92 | | Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was |
---|
99 | 93 | | deployed while serving on active federal military duty; |
---|
100 | 94 | | (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be |
---|
101 | 95 | | awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service |
---|
102 | 96 | | from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the |
---|
103 | 97 | | service member was deployed while serving on active federal |
---|
104 | 98 | | military duty, after: |
---|
105 | 99 | | (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi |
---|
106 | 100 | | Freedom; or |
---|
107 | 101 | | (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New |
---|
108 | 102 | | Dawn; [and] |
---|
109 | 103 | | (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall |
---|
110 | 104 | | be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service |
---|
111 | 105 | | from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of |
---|
112 | 106 | | Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the |
---|
113 | 107 | | service member was deployed while serving on active federal |
---|
114 | 108 | | military duty; and |
---|
115 | 109 | | (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection |
---|
116 | 110 | | (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this |
---|
117 | 111 | | state or the United States [Texas National Guard or the Texas State |
---|
118 | 112 | | Guard] who: |
---|
119 | 113 | | (A) served between September 2, 1945, and |
---|
120 | 114 | | December 26, 1991; and |
---|
121 | 115 | | (B) was a resident of this state at the time the |
---|
122 | 116 | | service member entered military service[, subject to Subsection |
---|
123 | 117 | | (c)]. |
---|
124 | 118 | | (b) A person may be awarded only one Texas Superior Service |
---|
125 | 119 | | Medal. |
---|
126 | 120 | | (c) A person described by Subsection (a)(15) may be awarded |
---|
127 | 121 | | a Cold War Medal only if: |
---|
128 | 122 | | (1) a federal Cold War Medal or an equivalent federal |
---|
129 | 123 | | medal is not available to be awarded; and |
---|
130 | 124 | | (2) a fee in the amount necessary to cover the costs of |
---|
131 | 125 | | awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's department. |
---|
132 | 126 | | SECTION 2. Section 431.134, Government Code, is repealed. |
---|
133 | 127 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|