E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5461
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1715
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5459
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5187
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5187
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5187
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#708
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2635
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|