House | 05/01/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 860 | Journal Page: 2298 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Postponed | 5/1/15 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 2106 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Postponed | 4/29/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 1571 |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1571 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1471 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Filed |