E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5789
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1781
|
Journal Page: 5789
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5782
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3497
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3497
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3419
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1137
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Dale
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
5-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
6-E. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Moody
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|