E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3777
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1192
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3777
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|