E
|
05/29/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1215
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#427
|
Journal Page: 2070
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2070
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2070
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|