E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4924
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1596
|
Journal Page: 4925
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4924
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1635
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 661
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 661
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|