LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2162
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2162
Compare Versions
HB2162 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2162 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2162 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB2162 Comm Sub May 25, 2015
HB2162 Engrossed May 8, 2015
HB2162 Comm Sub April 27, 2015
HB2162 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2162 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2162 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2162 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB2162 Comm Sub May 25, 2015
HB2162 Engrossed May 8, 2015
HB2162 Comm Sub April 27, 2015
HB2162 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare