E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5322
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1685
|
Journal Page: 5322
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5322
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2697
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#701
|
Journal Page: 2697
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2697
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman and Cook
|
Journal Page: 2697
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Cook
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|