Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2193 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2193
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the office of a public defender appointed by the
 Commissioners Court of Randall County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 26.053, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *