Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2194 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 2194
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 19, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 24, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of leaving a motor vehicle unattended.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.404, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.404.  UNATTENDED MOTOR VEHICLE. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), an [An] operator may not leave a [the]
 vehicle unattended without:
 (1)  stopping the engine;
 (2)  locking the ignition;
 (3)  removing the key from the ignition;
 (4)  setting the parking brake effectively; and
 (5)  if standing on a grade, turning the front wheels to
 the curb or side of the highway.
 (b)  The requirements of Subsections (a)(1), (2), and (3) do
 not apply to an operator who starts the engine of a vehicle by using
 a remote starter or other similar device that:
 (1)  remotely starts the vehicle's engine without
 placing the key in the ignition; and
 (2)  requires the key to be placed in the ignition or
 physically present in the vehicle before the vehicle can be
 operated.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *