Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1100 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1851 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1851 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1851 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed |