E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3904
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/02/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#490
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|