Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1397 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#651 | Journal Page: 2583 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-Raymond | Journal Page: 2583 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2532 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Amended | 1-Wray | Journal Page: 2530 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2530 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 687 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 687 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed |