Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2216 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman, Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2216
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information required of an applicant for a driver's
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.142, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (e-1), the [The] application must
 include any other information the department requires to determine
 the applicant's identity, residency, competency, and eligibility
 as required by the department or state law.
 (e-1)  Other than a general inquiry as to whether the
 applicant has a mental condition that may affect the applicant's
 ability to safely operate a motor vehicle, an application may not
 include an inquiry regarding the mental health of the applicant,
 including an inquiry as to whether the applicant has been diagnosed
 with, treated for, or hospitalized for a psychiatric disorder.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for a driver's license filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application filed before the
 effective date of this Act is subject to the law in effect on the
 date of filing, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *