House | 05/14/2015 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 3502 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | 4-Krause | Journal Page: 3502 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment amended | 3-Huberty | Journal Page: 3501 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 1-Huberty | Journal Page: 3495 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3494 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed |