House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 691 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 691 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed |