Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3008 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#876 | Journal Page: 3007 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3007 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3006 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3006 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2998 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 1-Alonzo | Journal Page: 2997 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2997 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 2963 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |