Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3416 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1073 | Journal Page: 3416 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3416 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3415 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3333 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3333 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3332 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 2-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 3331 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 3331 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3331 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 8:00 PM | Journal Page: 3249 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3249 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed |