Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2272 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raney (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2272
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to surety bond requirements for reserve deputy sheriffs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 85.004, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), a  [A] reserve
 deputy, before beginning to perform the duties of office and at the
 time of appointment, must file an oath and execute and file a bond
 in the amount of $2,000 payable to the sheriff. The oath and bond
 shall be filed with the county clerk.
 (c-1)  If a sheriff appoints more than one reserve deputy
 sheriff, the sheriff may execute a blanket surety bond to cover the
 reserve deputy sheriffs. Instead of a reserve deputy sheriff
 executing an individual bond under Subsection (c) or the sheriff
 executing a blanket surety bond, the county may self-insure against
 losses that would have been covered by the bond.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *