E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4863
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1583
|
Journal Page: 4864
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4863
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2007
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2007
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2007
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|