Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1258 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2344 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2149 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |