Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2290 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Parker, Meyer, Frullo H.B. No. 2290
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating January as Human Trafficking Prevention
 Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.107 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.107.  HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION MONTH.
 (a)  January is Human Trafficking Prevention Month to increase
 awareness of human trafficking in an effort to encourage people to
 alert authorities to any suspected incidents involving human
 trafficking.
 (b)  Human Trafficking Prevention Month may be regularly
 observed through appropriate activities in public schools and other
 places to increase awareness and prevention of human trafficking.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *