Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2295 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R10175 JRJ-D
 By: Meyer H.B. No. 2295


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the date of the election for trustees of an independent
 school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.0581(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An election for trustees of an independent school
 district shall be held on the same date as[:
 [(1)   the election for the members of the governing body
 of a municipality located in the school district;
 [(2)] the general election for state and county
 officers[;
 [(3)   the election for the members of the governing body
 of a hospital district, if the school district:
 [(A)     is wholly or partly located in a county with
 a population of less than 40,000 that is adjacent to a county with a
 population of more than three million; and
 [(B)     held its election for trustees jointly with
 the election for the members of the governing body of the hospital
 district before May 2007; or
 [(4)     the election for the members of the governing
 board of a public junior college district in which the school
 district is wholly or partly located].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 11.059(a) and (e), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A trustee of an independent school district serves a
 term of [three or] four years.
 (e)  Not later than December 31, 2015 [2011], the board of
 trustees may adopt a resolution changing the length of the terms of
 its trustees.  The resolution must provide for staggered terms of
 [either three or] four years and specify the manner in which the
 transition from the length of the former term to the modified term
 is made.  The transition must begin with the first regular election
 for trustees that occurs after January 1, 2016 [2012], and a trustee
 who serves on that date shall serve the remainder of that
 term.  This subsection expires January 1, 2021 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.065(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Sections 11.052(g) and (h) and Section [Sections]
 11.059(a) [and (b)] do not apply to the board of trustees of a
 school district if:
 (1)  the district's central administrative office is
 located in a county with a population of more than two million; and
 (2)  the district's student enrollment is more than
 125,000 and less than 200,000.
 SECTION 4.  Section 11.059(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.