House | 05/05/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 700 | Journal Page: 2462 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 719 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 719 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |