Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2301 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Riddle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2301
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to time credits awarded against the cumulative period of
 commitment or treatment of certain defendants determined to be
 incompetent to stand trial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 46B.0095(d), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 as added by Chapter 822 (H.B. 2725), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a defendant with respect to whom any proceeding under Chapter
 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure, is conducted on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *