House | 04/30/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 45 | Journal Page: 2126 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |