Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#692
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|