House
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 839
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|