E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4979
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 961
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#242
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#230
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|