Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 05/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3609 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1140 | Journal Page: 3608 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3494 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3494 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |