Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2366 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Goldman, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2366
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the notation on the precinct list of registered voters
 that a voter voted early.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 87.122(c), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The clerk shall enter "early voting voter" beside the
 name of each person on the precinct list of registered voters whose
 name appears on the list of early voting voters and shall deliver
 the precinct list to the presiding judge of the election precinct
 not later than the day before election day.
 SECTION 2.  Section 62.014(b), Election Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *