Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2393 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/05/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R6082 CAE-D
 By: Anchia H.B. No. 2393


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to additional compensation for a person wrongfully
 imprisoned.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 103, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 103.0521 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 103.0521.  ADDITIONAL COMPENSATION. (a)
 Notwithstanding Section 103.003, a person who received
 compensation under this chapter before September 1, 2009, is
 entitled to additional compensation as provided by Subsection (b).
 (b)  A person entitled to receive additional compensation
 under Subsection (a) shall receive an amount based on a present
 value sum equal to the amount the person would receive under
 Sections 103.052(a) and (b), if the person were to receive
 compensation under those sections on September 1, 2009, less the
 total amount of money received by the person under Section 103.052
 before September 1, 2009.
 (c)  A person seeking additional compensation under this
 section must file an application with the comptroller for
 additional compensation not later than September 1, 2018. The
 comptroller shall make payments to a claimant under this section
 not later than the 30th day after the date the comptroller
 determines the claimant is eligible to receive compensation under
 this section.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.