Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2394 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Darby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2394
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compelled production of certain customer records by
 a financial institution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 59.006, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  If the requesting party has not paid a financial
 institution's costs or posted a cost bond as required by Subsection
 (b)(2), a court may not:
 (1)  order the financial institution to produce a
 record in response to the record request; or
 (2)  find the financial institution to be in contempt
 of court for failing to produce the record.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a record request submitted on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A record request submitted before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the request was
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *