Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2400 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac, et al. H.B. No. 2400
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NelsonX
 HinojosaX
 BettencourtX
 EltifeX
 HancockX
 HuffmanX
 KolkhorstX
 NicholsX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 Taylorof GalvestonX
 UrestiX
 WatsonX
 WestX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of a new motor vehicle to certain manufacturers
 or distributors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.001(2), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (2)  "Retail sale" means a sale of a motor vehicle
 except:
 (A)  the sale of a new motor vehicle in which the
 purchaser is a franchised dealer who is authorized by law and by
 franchise agreement to offer the vehicle for sale as a new motor
 vehicle and who acquires the vehicle either for the exclusive
 purpose of sale in the manner provided by law or for purposes
 allowed under Chapter 503, Transportation Code;
 (B)  the sale of a vehicle other than a new motor
 vehicle in which the purchaser is a dealer who holds a dealer's
 general distinguishing number issued under Chapter 503,
 Transportation Code, and who acquires the vehicle either for the
 exclusive purpose of resale in the manner provided by law or for
 purposes allowed under Chapter 503, Transportation Code; [or]
 (C)  the sale to a franchised dealer of a new motor
 vehicle removed from the franchised dealer's inventory for the
 purpose of entering into a contract to lease the vehicle to another
 person if, immediately after executing the lease contract, the
 franchised dealer transfers title of the vehicle and assigns the
 lease contract to the lessor of the vehicle; or
 (D)  the sale of a new motor vehicle in which the
 purchaser is a manufacturer or distributor as those terms are
 defined by Section 2301.002, Occupations Code, who acquires the
 motor vehicle either for the exclusive purpose of sale in the manner
 provided by law or for purposes allowed under Section 503.064,
 Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *