Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2401 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Isaac (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2401
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of the Crosswinds Municipal Utility
 District; providing authority to issue bonds for road projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8468.005(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The district is created to accomplish the purposes of:
 (1)  a municipal utility district as provided by
 general law and Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  Section 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, that
 relate to the construction, acquisition, improvement, operation,
 or maintenance of macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 8468, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Sections 8468.104 and
 8468.105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 8468.104.  AUTHORITY FOR ROAD PROJECTS. Under Section
 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, the district may design,
 acquire, construct, finance, issue bonds for, improve, operate,
 maintain, and convey to this state, a county, or a municipality for
 operation and maintenance macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 Sec. 8468.105.  ROAD STANDARDS AND REQUIREMENTS. (a) A road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards, zoning and
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each municipality in
 whose corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction the road
 project is located.
 (b)  If a road project is not located in the corporate limits
 or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality, the road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards,
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each county in which
 the road project is located.
 (c)  If the state will maintain and operate the road, the
 Texas Transportation Commission must approve the plans and
 specifications of the road project.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8468.151, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The district may not issue bonds payable from ad valorem
 taxes to finance a road project unless the issuance is approved by a
 vote of a two-thirds majority of the district voters voting at an
 election held for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter E, Chapter 8468, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8468.203 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8468.203.  BONDS FOR ROAD PROJECTS. At the time of
 issuance, the total principal amount of bonds or other obligations
 issued or incurred to finance road projects and payable from ad
 valorem taxes may not exceed one-fourth of the assessed value of the
 real property in the district.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *